ICE AGE INSIGHTS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Preparing a bid for monies to continue archaeological instigation of the Late Upper Palaeolithic in the East Midlands.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England
Governance
- 10 October 2016: CIO registration
- ICE AGE JOURNEYS (Working name)
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr IAN NICHOLAS ROSS PHD, FRCP | Chair | 11 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
Dr Colin Baker | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
PROF. NICK BARTON BA, DEA, MA, DPHIL, FSA | Trustee | 11 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
MRS SUE COTTON FCA | Trustee | 11 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
JOHN LESLIE MILLER | Trustee | 11 March 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £45.62k | £34.85k | £1.58k | £9.98k | £3.19k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.46k | £2.46k | £18.00k | £23.97k | £3.61k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 19 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 19 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 18 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 18 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 13 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 13 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 13 November 2020 | 13 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 13 November 2020 | 13 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 10 Oct 2016
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN PREHISTORY AND IN THE PRACTICES OF ARCHAEOLOGY AND GEOLOGY AND TO PROMOTE RESEARCH FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN ALL ASPECTS OF THOSE SUBJECTS AND TO PUBLISH THE USEFUL RESULTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
50 BROADGATE
BEESTON
NOTTINGHAM
NG9 2FW
- Phone:
- 0787 013 6086
- Email:
- iceageinsights1@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window