VOLUNTARY SERVICE ASSOCIATION (NORTHALLERTON AND DISTRICT)
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Northallerton & District Voluntary Service Association aims to stimulate and encourage voluntary work within the community by supporting other voluntary organisations, promoting liaison between the voluntary and statutory sector, developing new organisations to meet new needs and finally through the work of our volunteer centres, community visiting projects and transport projects.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2016
Total income includes £175,587 from government grant(s)
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- North Yorkshire
Governance
- 13 March 1979: Standard registration
- 02 February 2017: Removed (Amalgamated)
- 02 February 2017: Funds transferred to 1164895 HAMBLETON COMMUNITY ACTION
- NORTHALLERTON & DISTRICT VOLUNTARY SERVICE ASSOCIATION OR V S A (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2012 | 31/03/2013 | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | 30/09/2016 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £323.14k | £410.44k | £277.95k | £300.83k | £300.83k | |
|
Total expenditure | £328.26k | £338.55k | £335.30k | £356.40k | £356.40k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £133.00k | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £20.50k | £175.59k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2016 | 30 January 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2016 | 30 January 2017 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2015 | 12 January 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2015 | 12 January 2016 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2014 | 13 January 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2014 | 13 January 2015 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2013 | 14 January 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2013 | 14 January 2014 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 22 FEBRUARY 1979 AS AMENDED 25 APRIL 1983, 12 MAY 1987, 12 JUNE 1989 AND 3 SEPTEMBER 1990.
Charitable objects
THE ASSOCIATION IS ESTABLISHED TO PROMOTE ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY IN THE AREA OF NORTHALLERTON AND DISTRICT (HEREINAFTER CALLED "THE AREA OF BENEFIT") AND, IN PARTICULAR, THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, THE PROTECTION OF HEALTH AND THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, DISTRESS AND SICKNESS.
Area of benefit
NORTHALLERTON AND DISTRICT
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window