Financial history GLOBAL SUPPORT MINISTRY

Charity number: 1171145
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 03/04/2020 03/04/2021 03/04/2022 03/04/2023 03/04/2024
Total gross income £2.97k £3.49k £11.91k £18.19k £6.64k
Total expenditure £2.81k £3.30k £10.57k £14.48k £9.76k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A