Accounts and annual returns Oxford Kurdish Association

Charity number: 1169977
Charity reporting is overdue by 742 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 11 days
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 11 days
Annual return 30 June 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 376 days
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 376 days
Annual return 30 June 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 742 days
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 742 days
Annual return 30 June 2021 27 May 2022 27 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 27 May 2022 27 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2020 25 June 2021 56 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 25 June 2021 56 days late Download Open in new window