Financial history AL MADINA TRUST

Charity number: 1172215
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £208.52k £103.53k £78.12k £87.43k £152.41k
Total expenditure £250.90k £37.32k £78.73k £87.80k £151.72k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £11.25k N/A N/A N/A