Accounts and annual returns SERVING HANDS UK

Charity number: 1170450
Charity reporting is overdue by 1518 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 04 May 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 57 days
Accounts and TAR 04 May 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 57 days
Annual return 04 May 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 422 days
Accounts and TAR 04 May 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 422 days
Annual return 04 May 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 788 days
Accounts and TAR 04 May 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 788 days
Annual return 04 May 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1153 days
Accounts and TAR 04 May 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1153 days
Annual return 04 May 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1518 days
Accounts and TAR 04 May 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1518 days