SEVENOAKS SUNS BASKETBALL CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The provision of amateur sport (basketball) for children and young people and the general public, through providing buildings/facilities/open spaces; services; and advocacy/advice/information, in England and Wales.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Bexley
- Bromley
- East Sussex
- Kent
- Medway
- Surrey
Governance
- 20 April 2017: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
RICHARD STERLING SURREY | Chair | 01 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
Philip Webb | Trustee | 11 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
Margot Nicoline von Aesch | Trustee | 21 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Kapil Kumar | Trustee | 10 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
DAVID PAUL TURNER | Trustee | 11 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
CARLOS JOSEPH HENRY | Trustee | 13 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
LEONARD JAMES BUSCH | Trustee | 13 September 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £192.00k | £88.97k | £242.51k | £280.49k | £218.49k | |
|
Total expenditure | £194.74k | £102.98k | £204.20k | £289.01k | £228.27k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £11.85k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 25 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 25 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 07 May 2024 | 7 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 07 May 2024 | 7 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 05 July 2023 | 66 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 05 July 2023 | 66 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 30 June 2022 | 61 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 30 June 2022 | 61 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 19 November 2021 | 203 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 19 November 2021 | 203 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 05 AUG 2014 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 08 MAR 2017
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION OF COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR THE PLAYING OF BASKETBALL
Contact information
- Address:
-
PO Box 577
SEVENOAKS
TN13 9RU
- Phone:
- 07771600207
- Email:
- info@sevenoakssuns.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window