Financial history EXPRESSIONS COMMUNITY ARTS

Charity number: 1178488
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £8.82k £9.99k £18.36k £12.85k £13.00k
Total expenditure £0 £8.94k £12.43k £10.85k £11.00k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £4.92k N/A N/A