PRUDHOE YOUTH CLUB FOOTBALL CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity engages in the promotion of community participation in healthy recreation in Prudhoe, Northumberland and its surrounding areas in particular by the provision of facilities for the playing of youth and adult football
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2023
Total income includes £2,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
35 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Northumberland
Governance
- 20 March 2017: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Duncan GRAHAM | Chair | 20 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
RICK HAYMAN | Trustee | 20 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
DAVID HOLMES | Trustee | 20 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
TIM BLOOMER | Trustee | 20 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
MARK DUTTON | Trustee | 20 March 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2019 | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £69.97k | £60.24k | £76.80k | £83.66k | £59.89k | |
|
Total expenditure | £84.74k | £81.06k | £62.03k | £88.41k | £61.60k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £1.00k | N/A | £8.64k | £2.00k | £2.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 18 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 18 days | |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 14 October 2024 | 167 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 14 October 2024 | 167 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 24 August 2023 | 116 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 24 August 2023 | 116 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 19 June 2022 | 50 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 19 June 2022 | 50 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 30 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 30 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 20 Mar 2017
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CLUB SHALL BE 'THE PROMOTION OF COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION IN PRUDHOE, NORTHUMBERLAND AND ITS SURROUNDING AREAS IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR THE PLAYING OF YOUTH AND ADULT FOOTBALL’. NOTHING IN THIS CONSTITUTION SHALL AUTHORISE AN APPLICATION OF THE PROPERTY OF THE CIO FOR THE PURPOSES WHICH ARE NOT CHARITABLE IN ACCORDANCE WITH SECTION 7 OF THE CHARITIES AND TRUSTEE INVESTMENT (SCOTLAND) ACT 2005 AND SECTION 2 OF THE CHARITIES ACT (NORTHERN IRELAND) 2008.
Contact information
- Address:
-
10 Elsdon Place
St. Georges Wood
MORPETH
Northumberland
NE61 2GY
- Phone:
- 07795627002
- Email:
- pycfc@hotmail.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window