THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST PETER & ST PAUL, BASSINGBOURN

Charity Number: 1169787
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

- General Charitable activities - Religious activities and services - Provision of local spaces for community use - Activities for children and families - Concerts and entertainment - Support of vulnerable individuals and families in the community

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £138,763
Total expenditure: £70,195

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Other Finance
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Cambridgeshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 19 October 2016: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • BASSINGBOURN PCC (Working name)
  • THE PCC OF ST PETER AND ST PAUL, BASSINGBOURN (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

14 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev Helen McGowan Orr Chair 19 October 2021
None on record
Joanna Jones Trustee 05 September 2023
None on record
Michael William Hallett Trustee 15 May 2022
None on record
Simon Morris Trustee 25 February 2020
None on record
Stephen Renwick Trustee 07 April 2019
None on record
MICHELLE RENWICK Trustee 24 April 2018
None on record
VICTOR JULIUS NICKSON Trustee 24 April 2018
None on record
Rev Amanda O'Neill Trustee 15 April 2018
None on record
JAY DERRETT Trustee 16 October 2016
None on record
VICTOR SKUCE Trustee 16 October 2016
None on record
Dr RENATE MARSH Trustee 16 October 2016
None on record
Nick Jones Trustee 16 October 2016
None on record
ERICA COOMBER Trustee 16 October 2016
None on record
MARGARET WHITE Trustee 16 October 2016
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £116.97k £58.47k £100.79k £100.01k £138.76k
Total expenditure £62.93k £69.60k £57.48k £80.27k £70.19k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 10 May 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 10 May 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 01 June 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 01 June 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 19 May 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 19 May 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 24 May 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 24 May 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 19 May 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 19 May 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
THE CHURCH OFFICE
23 NORTH END
BASSINGBOURN
ROYSTON
SG8 5NZ
Phone:
01763877558