Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST PETER & ST PAUL, BASSINGBOURN
Charity number: 1169787

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Helen McGowan Orr | Chair | 19 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Joanna Jones | Trustee | 05 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Michael William Hallett | Trustee | 15 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Simon Morris | Trustee | 25 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Renwick | Trustee | 07 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
MICHELLE RENWICK | Trustee | 24 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
VICTOR JULIUS NICKSON | Trustee | 24 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Rev Amanda O'Neill | Trustee | 15 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
JAY DERRETT | Trustee | 16 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
VICTOR SKUCE | Trustee | 16 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
Dr RENATE MARSH | Trustee | 16 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
Nick Jones | Trustee | 16 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
ERICA COOMBER | Trustee | 16 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
MARGARET WHITE | Trustee | 16 October 2016 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.