THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF HIGHAM (ST JOHN THE EVANGELIST) WITH MERSTON

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Promotion of Christianity and the whole mission of the Church through: Teaching Public worship open to all. Pastoral work, e.g. visiting sick, bereaved, activities for senior citizens. Assisting local schools by governing, providing facilities for education and worship. Running young persons' and children's groups with a Christian ethos. Supporting other charities in the UK and overseas.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

14 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Kent
Governance
- 27 October 2016: Standard registration
- ST JOHN, HIGHAM, KENT (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Claire Howes | Trustee | 21 April 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Neil Jerome | Trustee | 21 April 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Lynne Mary Chesterton | Trustee | 21 April 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Catherine Ody | Trustee | 19 June 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Rev CLIVE WESLEY JONES | Trustee | 19 June 2022 |
|
|||||||
Elizabeth Croker | Trustee | 24 April 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Tracey Ann Jerome | Trustee | 24 April 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Nancy Lee Hughes | Trustee | 18 October 2020 |
|
|
||||||
CAROLE ELIZABETH ROUGH | Trustee | 21 April 2019 |
|
|
||||||
TERESA ELIZABETH ESTELLA JOBLIN | Trustee | 29 April 2018 |
|
|||||||
ANNE MARGARET TAMMAS-WILLIAMS | Trustee | 29 April 2018 |
|
|
||||||
SARAH CATHERINE WRIGHT | Trustee | 21 November 2017 |
|
|
||||||
Helen Walker | Trustee | 17 April 2016 |
|
|||||||
MRS VAL LAURENS | Trustee | 17 April 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £94.81k | £90.74k | £85.99k | £94.89k | £88.96k | |
|
Total expenditure | £86.44k | £118.52k | £89.39k | £91.39k | £90.88k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 22 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 22 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 10 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 10 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 21 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 21 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 27 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 27 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 22 November 2020 | 22 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 22 November 2020 | 22 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES THAT CAME INTO FORCE ON 02 JAN 1957
Charitable objects
PROMOTING IN THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH THE WHOLE MISSION OF THE CHURCH
Contact information
- Address:
-
11 St. Johns Road
Higham
ROCHESTER
ME3 7BZ
- Phone:
- 01474396569
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window