Financial history ECOVIS LONDON FOUNDATION (NON-PROFIT ORGANISATION)

Charity number: 1170290
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £24.11k £19.00k £29.71k £24.95k £24.63k
Total expenditure £16.05k £21.00k £27.38k £30.41k £24.63k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A