CREATIVE CONSCIENCE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Creative Conscience is a global movement that aims to improve the communities we live and work in, helping to transform the wider world. We promote socially valuable, human centred design that enables and inspires people to change their lives and the lives of those around them for the better.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England
- Scotland
Governance
- 09 November 2016: CIO registration
No other names
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Paul Barlow | Trustee | 27 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Rifa Sultana Thorpe-Tracey | Trustee | 10 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Professor Lawerence Zeegen | Trustee | 01 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Nicole Yershon | Trustee | 01 January 2000 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £52.30k | £61.40k | £59.59k | £46.73k | £56.23k | |
|
Total expenditure | £40.97k | £57.29k | £15.63k | £48.02k | £54.09k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 30 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | 30 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 26 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | 26 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 29 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | 29 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 25 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | 25 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 26 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 May 2020
(These accounts |
26 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 09 Nov 2016
Charitable objects
1) FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF YOUNG PEOPLE STUDYING, AND PEOPLE WHO HAVE STUDIED, IN THE CREATIVE DISCIPLINES (INCLUDING, BUT NOT LIMITED TO, ADVERTISING, ARCHITECTURE, FASHION & TEXTILE DESIGN, FILM & PHOTOGRAPHY, GRAPHIC DESIGN, ILLUSTRATION AND ANIMATION, AND PRODUCT & STRUCTURAL DESIGN), DEVELOPING THEIR CREATIVE TALENTS AND MORAL CAPABILITIES BY: • ORGANISING AND PROMOTING AWARDS FOR PROJECTS IN THE CREATIVE DISCIPLINES THAT ARE PROMOTING SUSTAINABILITY, FREEDOM, SOCIAL HEALTH AND WELL-BEING. • ORGANISING AND PROMOTING AWARD CEREMONIES THAT SHOWCASE THE WINNING PROJECTS AND BRING YOUNG PEOPLE INTO CONTACT WITH LEADERS IN THE CREATIVE INDUSTRIES, BUSINESSES AND THE THIRD SECTOR, THUS INSPIRING THEM AND EXTENDING THEIR CREATIVE IMAGINATIONS. • PROVIDING MENTORSHIP FOR THE WINNERS AND OTHERS OF MERIT, SUCH THAT THEIR EDUCATION AND FUTURE PROFESSIONAL DEVELOPMENT WILL BE ENHANCED. • HELPING BRING THEIR PROJECTS TO IMPLEMENTATION. 2) TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THE CONSERVATION AND PROTECTION OF THE ENVIRONMENT AND TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN CONSERVATION OF THE ENVIRONMENT THROUGH HELPING THE IMPLEMENTATION OF PROJECTS IN THAT AREA. 3) TO PROMOTE SUSTAINABLE DEVELOPMENT FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC BY THE PRESERVATION, CONSERVATION AND THE PROTECTION OF THE ENVIRONMENT AND THE PRUDENT USE OF RESOURCES AND TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN SUBJECTS RELATING TO SUSTAINABLE DEVELOPMENT AND THE PROTECTION, ENHANCEMENT AND REHABILITATION OF THE ENVIRONMENT THROUGH HELPING THE IMPLEMENTATION OF PROJECTS IN THAT AREA. SUSTAINABLE DEVELOPMENT MEANS “DEVELOPMENT WHICH MEETS THE NEEDS OF THE PRESENT WITHOUT COMPROMISING THE ABILITY OF FUTURE GENERATIONS TO MEET THEIR OWN NEEDS.” 4) TO PROMOTE HUMAN RIGHTS (AS SET OUT IN THE UNIVERSAL DECLARATION OF HUMAN RIGHTS AND SUBSEQUENT UNITED NATIONS CONVENTIONS AND DECLARATIONS) THROUGHOUT THE WORLD BY HELPING THE IMPLEMENTATION OF PROJECTS THAT INVOLVE: • RAISING AWARENESS OF HUMAN RIGHTS ISSUES; • PROMOTING PUBLIC SUPPORT FOR HUMAN RIGHTS; • PROMOTING RESPECT FOR HUMAN RIGHTS AMONG INDIVIDUALS AND CORPORATIONS; • INTERNATIONAL ADVOCACY OF HUMAN RIGHTS. IN FURTHERANCE OF THAT OBJECT BUT NOT OTHERWISE, THE TRUSTEES SHALL HAVE POWER TO ENGAGE IN POLITICAL ACTIVITY PROVIDED THAT THE TRUSTEES ARE SATISFIED THAT THE PROPOSED ACTIVITIES WILL FURTHER THE PURPOSES OF THE CHARITY TO AN EXTENT JUSTIFIED BY THE RESOURCES COMMITTED AND THE ACTIVITY IS NOT THE DOMINANT MEANS BY WHICH THE CHARITY CARRIED OUT ITS OBJECTS. 5) TO PROMOTE EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THROUGH HELPING THE IMPLEMENTATION OF PROJECTS IN THOSE AREAS. 6) TO PROMOTE SOCIAL INCLUSION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY PREVENTING PEOPLE FROM BECOMING SOCIALLY EXCLUDED, RELIEVING THE NEEDS OF THOSE PEOPLE WHO ARE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED AND ASSISTING THEM TO INTEGRATE INTO SOCIETY THROUGH HELPING THE IMPLEMENTATION OF PROJECTS IN THAT AREA. FOR THE PURPOSE OF THIS CLAUSE ‘SOCIALLY EXCLUDED’ MEANS BEING EXCLUDED FROM SOCIETY, OR PARTS OF SOCIETY, AS A RESULT OF ONE OF MORE OF THE FOLLOWING FACTORS: UNEMPLOYMENT; FINANCIAL HARDSHIP; YOUTH OR OLD AGE; ILL HEALTH (PHYSICAL OR MENTAL); SUBSTANCE ABUSE OR DEPENDENCY INCLUDING ALCOHOL AND DRUGS; DISCRIMINATION ON THE GROUNDS OF SEX, RACE, DISABILITY, ETHNIC ORIGIN, RELIGION, BELIEF, CREED, SEXUAL ORIENTATION OR GENDER RE-ASSIGNMENT; POOR EDUCATIONAL OR SKILLS ATTAINMENT; RELATIONSHIP AND FAMILY BREAKDOWN; POOR HOUSING (THAT IS HOUSING THAT DOES NOT MEET BASIC HABITABLE STANDARDS; CRIME (EITHER AS A VICTIM OF CRIME OR AS AN OFFENDER REHABILITATING INTO SOCIETY). 7) TO PROMOTE PHYSICAL AND MENTAL HEALTH AND WELL-BEING THROUGH HELPING THE IMPLEMENTATION OF PROJECTS IN THAT AREA.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Unit 308
Screenworks
22 Highbury Grove
LONDON
N5 2ER
- Phone:
- 07947065467
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window