Financial history CROSSWAYS YOUTH AND COMMUNITY CENTRE

Charity number: 1168961
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £22.15k £29.37k £31.84k £20.43k £21.81k
Total expenditure £18.14k £18.79k £35.66k £23.18k £22.88k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £17.34k £13.33k £1.00k N/A