Financial history MY DESTINY MINISTRIES LIMITED

Charity number: 1170154
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2020 30/04/2021 30/04/2022 30/04/2023 30/04/2024
Total gross income £9.13k £7.89k £8.74k £7.90k £8.41k
Total expenditure £8.04k £8.04k £7.92k £7.21k £9.48k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A