Financial history GIFTINGHUMANITY

Charity Number: 1170479
Regulatory alert
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2017 30/04/2018 30/04/2019 30/04/2021 30/04/2022
Total gross income £27.90k £247.13k £145.50k £201.79k £226.97k
Total expenditure £22.82k £232.81k £19.90k £194.03k £246.24k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A