Trustees EUROPEAN ASSOCIATION FOR CANCER RESEARCH
Charity number: 1171827

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
16 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PROFESSOR CAROLINE DIVE | Chair | 10 July 2016 |
|
|
||||
Professor Johanna Joyce | Trustee | 13 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Sophie Postel-Vinay | Trustee | 13 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Chiara Ambrogio | Trustee | 21 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Maria Soengas Gonzalez | Trustee | 21 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Jukka Kristian Westermarck | Trustee | 21 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Neta Erez | Trustee | 21 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Professor Nuria Lopez Bigas | Trustee | 19 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Professor Evi Lianidou | Trustee | 19 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Elisa Oricchio | Trustee | 19 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Professor Rene Bernards | Trustee | 19 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Professor Arkaitz Carracedo | Trustee | 01 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Professor Andreas Trumpp | Trustee | 01 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Professor ALBERTO BARDELLI | Trustee | 10 July 2016 |
|
|
||||
Professor YARDENA SAMUELS PHD | Trustee | 10 July 2016 |
|
|
||||
Professor CARLOS CALDAS | Trustee | 06 July 2014 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.