BRIGHT SHADOW

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Bright Shadow's mission is to enable people with dementia, and those affected by it, to live well and to thrive. We do this through delivering Zest Workshops for people living with dementia in care and community settings. We also provide training to equip those delivering activities with people with dementia, and training to empower churches and arts and culture venues to be dementia inclusive.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £2,500 from 1 government grant(s)
People

9 Trustee(s)
26 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Economic/community Development/employment
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
Governance
- 09 January 2017: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ALISON MARGARET CULVERWELL | Chair | 09 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
Bernie Mayall | Trustee | 04 February 2025 |
|
|||||
Dr Sarah Hotham | Trustee | 04 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Sylvia Dawn Horne | Trustee | 05 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Gill Ashington | Trustee | 05 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Rasa Mikelyte | Trustee | 11 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Tracy Brunt | Trustee | 11 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Gillian Butchard | Trustee | 27 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Eddi Taylor | Trustee | 08 May 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £133.14k | £181.59k | £148.45k | £172.48k | £167.90k | |
|
Total expenditure | £124.69k | £121.65k | £169.49k | £166.78k | £170.52k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £20.46k | £13.02k | £12.57k | £4.98k | £2.50k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 24 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 24 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 27 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 27 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 07 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 07 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 28 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 28 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 05 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 05 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 09 Jan 2017
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: 1. TO ADVANCE THE HEALTH AND WELL BEING OF PEOPLE LIVING WITH DEMENTIA, AND PEOPLE WHO CARE FOR THEM, IN PARTICULAR BY PROMOTING THE USE OF CREATIVE ARTS. 2. TO PROMOTE SOCIAL INCLUSION AMONG PEOPLE DIAGNOSED WITH DEMENTIA WHO ARE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED FROM SOCIETY, OR PARTS OF SOCIETY, AS A RESULT OF THEIR DEMENTIA THROUGH THE DEVELOPMENT AND DELIVERY OF ARTS BASED ACTIVITIES AND EXPERIENCES INCLUDING BUT NOT LIMITED TO DANCE, MUSIC, DRAMA AND PUPPETRY. 3. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE SUBJECT OF DEMENTIA BY PROVIDING EDUCATION AND TRAINING THAT INCREASES THE UNDERSTANDING OF HOW ARTS AND CREATIVITY CAN ENABLE EXCELLENT DEMENTIA CARE, ENGAGING WITH PEOPLE WITH DEMENTIA AND THEIR SUPPORT NETWORK OF FAMILIES AND CARERS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Bright Shadow
Beach House
Beach Street
HERNE BAY
CT6 5PT
- Phone:
- 01227467272
- Email:
- info@brightshadow.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window