Saving Saints and Big Paws Rescue UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote humane behaviour towards animals by providing appropriate care, protection, treatment and security for St Bernard breed dogs and other large breed mixed dogs which are in need of care and attention by reason of sickness, maltreatment, poor circumstances or ill usage and to educate the public in matters pertaining to animal welfare in general and the prevention of cruelty and suffering.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
9 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Animals
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
- Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 10 January 2017: CIO registration
- SAVING SAINT BERNARDS AND BIG PAWS RESCUE UK (Working name)
- SAVING SAINTS / ST BERNARD AND BIG PAWS RESCUE UK (Working name)
- SAVING SAINTS RESCUE UK (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
RACHEL LEAH WESLEY | Chair | 12 August 2018 |
|
|
||||
Amanda Rees | Trustee | 10 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Tracey Jayne Turnbull | Trustee | 08 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Helen Mcguirl | Trustee | 01 December 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £22.85k | £24.83k | £24.71k | £22.65k | £23.94k | |
|
Total expenditure | £25.14k | £12.57k | £28.80k | £21.59k | £30.45k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 03 February 2024 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 09 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 18 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 18 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 21 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 21 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 16 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2020
(These accounts |
16 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 10 Jan 2017 as amended on 05 Oct 2020 as amended on 09 Nov 2023
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: (A) TO PROMOTE HUMANE BEHAVIOUR TOWARDS ANIMALS BY PROVIDING APPROPRIATE CARE, PROTECTION, TREATMENT AND SECURITY FOR ST BERNARD BREED DOGS AND OTHER LARGE BREED MIXED DOGS WHICH ARE IN NEED OF CARE AND ATTENTION BY REASON OF SICKNESS, MALTREATMENT, POOR CIRCUMSTANCES OR ILL USAGE AND TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN MATTERS PERTAINING TO ANIMAL WELFARE IN GENERAL AND THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY AND SUFFERING AMONG SUCH DOGS. (B) TO RELIEVE SICKNESS, SUFFERING AND DISTRESS AND TO PROMOTE GOOD HEALTH, ESPECIALLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY AMONGST CHILDREN AND VULNERABLE ADULTS, THROUGH OFFERING A PAT/COMPANION DOG SCHEME IN CONJUNCTION WITH MERSEYCARE NHS TRUST AND OTHER CARE SETTINGS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
27 BURGH WOOD WAY
CHORLEY
PR7 2FF
- Phone:
- 07759516241
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window