ENHANCING QUALIFICATIONS AND SOCIAL DEVELOPMENT (EQSD)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Increase social inclusion and life opportunities of disadvantaged active and inactive individuals through services such as; education, employment skills/jobs/ training, economic, heath, community and social support that enable whole well-being development and sustainable growth thereby making individuals living in Leicester City and Leicestershire more competitive and achieving.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £2,960 from 1 government grant(s)
People

3 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Economic/community Development/employment
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Leicester City
- Leicestershire
Governance
- 13 July 2017: CIO registration
- EQSD (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
RASHPAL SINGH BA-MA-LLB | Chair | 25 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
Adeyemi Aderinto | Trustee | 15 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
Haleema Aslam BAMSCMBA | Trustee | 08 September 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.50k | £4.50k | £4.35k | £4.35k | £7.18k | |
|
Total expenditure | £60 | £69 | £60 | £72 | £60 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £2.96k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 31 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 31 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 16 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 16 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 11 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 11 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 31 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 31 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 30 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 30 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 13 Jul 2017
Charitable objects
1) TO PROMOTE SOCIAL INCLUSION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY PREVENTING PEOPLE FROM BECOMING SOCIALLY EXCLUDED, RELIEVING THE NEEDS OF THOSE PEOPLE WHO ARE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED AND ASSISTING THEM TO INTEGRATE INTO SOCIETY BY PROVIDING EDUCATION AND TRAINING IN THE SUBJECTS OF ENGLISH LANGUAGE, MATHS, AND VOCATIONAL SKILLS AND SOCIAL, RECREATIONAL FACILITIES AND EVENTS INVOLVING THE LOCAL COMMUNITY. (FOR THE PURPOSES OF THIS CLAUSE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED MEANS PEOPLE WHO ARE EXCLUDED FROM SOCIETY, OR PARTS OF SOCIETY, AS A RESULT OF ONE OR MORE OF THE FOLLOWING FACTORS: UNEMPLOYMENT; FINANCIAL HARDSHIP; YOUTH OR OLD AGE; ILL HEALTH (PHYSICAL OR MENTAL); SUBSTANCE ABUSE OR DEPENDENCY INCLUDING ALCOHOL AND DRUGS; DISCRIMINATION ON THE GROUNDS OF SEX, RACE, DISABILITY, ETHNIC ORIGIN, RELIGION, BELIEF, CREED, SEXUAL ORIENTATION OR GENDER RE-ASSIGNMENT; POOR EDUCATIONAL OR SKILLS ATTAINMENT; RELATIONSHIP AND FAMILY BREAKDOWN; POOR HOUSING (THAT IS HOUSING THAT DOES NOT MEET BASIC HABITABLE STANDARDS; CRIME (EITHER AS A VICTIM OF CRIME OR AS AN OFFENDER REHABILITATING INTO SOCIETY). 2) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC OF LEICESTER AND LEICESTERSHIRE IN THE SUBJECT OF: BESPOKE AND TAILORED TRAINING; PROFESSIONAL QUALIFICATIONS, NVQS, SECTOR-SPECIFIC PROGRAMMES. 3) THE RELIEF OF UNEMPLOYMENT FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC OF LEICESTER AND LEICESTERSHIRE, IN OTHER SUCH WAYS AS MAYBE THOUGHT FIT, INCLUDING ASSISTANCE TO FIND EMPLOYMENT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
59 STOUGHTON ROAD
OADBY
LEICESTER
LE2 4FQ
- Phone:
- 07827997380
- Email:
- eqsd2015@outlook.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window