Accounts and annual returns MUSIC AGAINST ANIMAL CRUELTY

Charity number: 1170221
Charity reporting is overdue by 188 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 188 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 188 days
Annual return 31 December 2022 31 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 31 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 17 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 19 October 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 18 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 18 October 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 01 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 01 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window