CHURCH OF CHRIST (COMMERCIAL ROAD), TUNBRIDGE WELLS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Church of Christ (Commercial Road), holds regular worship and teaching services, prayer meetings, events, public celebration of religious festivals, produces/distributes literature to enlighten others about the Christian faith. We also carry out other charitable purposes: feeding the poor, working with children/young people, visiting the sick and elderly, supporting the homeless and those in need.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Kent
Governance
- 30 September 2016: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Leo Harvey | Trustee | 13 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Chris David Dare | Trustee | 13 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Jack Ingle | Trustee | 24 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Lynn Joyce Allen | Trustee | 22 June 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £44.01k | £36.13k | £42.96k | £46.40k | £49.34k | |
|
Total expenditure | £37.91k | £31.98k | £35.33k | £42.01k | £45.71k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 02 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 02 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 25 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 25 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 27 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 27 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 11 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 11 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 25 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 25 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 30 Sep 2016 as amended on 07 Jul 2024
Charitable objects
THE PRINCIPAL PURPOSE OF THE CIO IS THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE PRINCIPLES OF THE FELLOWSHIP OF CHURCHES OF CHRIST (FCC). - THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH RELIGION, MAINLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, BY MEANS OF BROADCASTING MESSAGES OF AN EVANGELISTIC AND TEACHING NATURE. - TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN TUNBRIDGE WELLS FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THROUGH THE HOLDING OF PRAYER MEETINGS, TALKS, EVENTS, PUBLIC CELEBRATION OF RELIGIOUS FESTIVALS, PRODUCING AND/OR DISTRIBUTING LITERATURE TO ENLIGHTEN OTHERS ABOUT THE CHRISTIAN FAITH. - THE CHURCH MAY ALSO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND CARRY OUT OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND/OR OTHER PARTS OF THE WORLD, INCLUDING FEEDING THE POOR, WORKING WITH CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE, VISITING THE SICK AND ELDERLY, SUPPORTING THE HOMELESS AND THOSE IN NEED.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Church of Christ
Commercial Road
Tunbridge Wells
Kent
TN1 2RR
- Phone:
- 01892514050
- Email:
- cllyallen@aol.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window