WILLOWS LULL
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Support for parents/carers with a child/young person with life-limiting and/or complex needs. Sibling support. Extended family support. Opportunities for interaction to forge better relationships within the community leading to more understanding and acceptance.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- East Riding Of Yorkshire
- North Yorkshire
Governance
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £89.26k | £241.27k | £38.38k | £67.94k | £23.44k | |
|
Total expenditure | £77.09k | £242.04k | £56.71k | £59.36k | £486.86k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £22.20k | £123.13k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £72.48k | £25.13k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 21 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 21 January 2024 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 30 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 30 December 2022 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 18 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 18 April 2022 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 20 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 20 April 2021 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 11 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 11 May 2020 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 05 Sep 2016
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE LIVING WITHIN THE YORKSHIRE COAST, EAST COAST AND RYEDALE AREA WHO ARE DISABLED, HAVE SPECIAL NEEDS OR LIFE-LIMITING CONDITIONS AND THEIR PARENTS/CARERS, BY THE PROVISION OF RESPITE, RECREATIONAL AND LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES IN ORDER TO ADDRESS THEIR NEEDS.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window