Financial history AUTORAISE

Charity Number: 1170068
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £281.08k £166.98k £146.56k £367.32k £238.55k
Total expenditure £228.62k £111.07k £50.48k £114.03k £198.67k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £10.29k N/A N/A N/A