AUTORAISE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance education and training and to relieve unemployment by such means as the trustees may consider appropriate including (but not limited to) providing apprentice schemes in the automotive industry and providing employment advice and liaising with employers to encourage an increase in the number of apprentice schemes available to young people in the UK.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 07 November 2016: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Simon Smith | Trustee | 01 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Martyn Rowley | Trustee | 01 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Guy Williams | Trustee | 16 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Weeks | Trustee | 27 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Michael Golding | Trustee | 27 September 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £281.08k | £166.98k | £146.56k | £367.32k | £238.55k | |
|
Total expenditure | £228.62k | £111.07k | £50.48k | £114.03k | £198.67k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.29k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 07 February 2024 | 7 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 07 February 2024 | 7 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 01 February 2023 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 01 February 2023 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 01 February 2022 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 01 February 2022 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 07 Nov 2016
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS:- TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TRAINING AND TO RELIEVE UNEMPLOYMENT BY SUCH MEANS AS THE TRUSTEES MAY CONSIDER APPROPRIATE INCLUDING (BUT NOT LIMITED TO)ROVIDING APPRENTICE SCHEMES IN THE AUTOMOTIVE INDUSTRY AND PROVIDING EMPLOYMENT ADVICE AND LIAISING WITH EMPLOYERS TO ENCOURAGE AN INCREASE IN THE NUMBER OF APPRENTICE SCHEMES AVAILABLE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
80 St. Georges Road
Jack Brown House
BOLTON
BL1 2DD
- Phone:
- 07376253953
- Email:
- accounts@autoraise.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window