WHITESTONE COMMUNITY CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Whitestone Community Centre run the local community centre and make this property available for hire to any group or member of the public for events and personal use. The centre is run as a non profit making business.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Warwickshire
Governance
- 23 May 1979: Standard registration
- COMMUNITY CENTRE (Working name)
- WHITESTONE COMMUNITY CENTRE (Working name)
- WHITESTONE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Heather Wakeling | Chair | 31 December 2016 |
|
|
||||
Dorothy Mary Loomans | Trustee | 31 December 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.81k | £10.00k | £11.19k | £11.35k | £10.73k | |
|
Total expenditure | £11.81k | £8.74k | £26.85k | £8.27k | £10.17k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | £6.00k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 21 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 21 September 2024 | 234 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 11 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 19 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 12 OCTOBER 1978 AS AMENDED ON 22 JUL 2017
Charitable objects
A) TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF WHITESTONE AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS AND INHABITANTS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND RO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHAVITANTS. B) TO ESTABLISH OR SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A COMMUNITY CENTRET.
Area of benefit
WHITE STONE AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD
Contact information
- Address:
-
Whitestone Infant School
Magyar Crescent
NUNEATON
Warwickshire
CV11 4SQ
- Phone:
- 02476101725
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window