THE FRIENDS OF THE PARISH CHURCH OF ST JOHN THE BAPTIST, KNARESBOROUGH
Charity number: 508567
Removed charity
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
What, who, how, where
What the charity does:
- Religious Activities
- Environment/conservation/heritage
Who the charity helps:
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
How the charity helps:
- Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
- North Yorkshire
Governance
Registration history:
- 24 May 1979: Standard registration
- 12 April 2008: Removed (Ceased to exist)
Organisation type:
Other names:
- THE FRIENDS (Working name)
- FRIENDS OF KNARESBOROUGH PARISH CHURCH (Previous name)
Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
No information available
Financial history
No financial information provided for the past 5 financial periods
Accounts and annual returns
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2005 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2005 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2004 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2004 | Not submitted |
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 18 MAY 1976 AS AMENDED 6 JULY 1978 AND 27 JUNE 1988
Charitable objects
TO MAINTAIN AND IMPROVE THE FABRIC FURNITURE FITTINGS ORNAMENTS MONUMENTS AND SERVICES OF THE KNARESBOROUGH PARISH CHURCH AND ITS PRECINCTS.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
KNARESBOROUGH
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window