THE EUROPEAN SOCIETY UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 03 October 2016: CIO registration
- TESUK (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
BEN GALLANT | Chair |
|
|
|||||
ALICE ANDERS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
AMELIA TURNER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 27 July 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 341 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 27 July 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 341 days | |
Annual return | 27 July 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 707 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 27 July 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 707 days | |
Annual return | 27 July 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1072 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 27 July 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1072 days | |
Annual return | 27 July 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1437 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 27 July 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1437 days | |
Annual return | 27 July 2019 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1802 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 27 July 2019 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1802 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 03 Oct 2016
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF YOUNG PEOPLE IN THE UK IN THE SUBJECT OF EUROPE AND EUROPEAN AFFAIRS. THIS WORK IS CARRIED OUT FOR THE BENEFIT OF ALL YOUNG PEOPLE IN THE UK.
Contact information
- Address:
-
JESUS COLLEGE
CAMBRIDGE
CB5 8BL
- Phone:
- 07805830823
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window