THE DR S C CLARK MEMORIAL FUND TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Directly or via the support of other Charitable Bodies to advance in life and relieve the needs of young people up to the age 21 years who are resident in the County of Somerset and particularly but not exclusively living in the locality of St Andrew's Church Congresbury.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- North Somerset
- Somerset
Governance
- 10 August 2016: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
FRANCES MARY MARTIN | Trustee | 02 November 2017 |
|
|
||||||||
MS E CRAN | Trustee | 24 July 2016 |
|
|
||||||||
REVEREND MATTHEW JAMES THOMSON | Trustee | 24 July 2016 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £13.60k | £10.09k | £27.95k | £1 | £2 | |
|
Total expenditure | £31.57k | £36.95k | £30.08k | £38.76k | £19.29k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 27 August 2024 | 88 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 15 June 2023 | 15 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 31 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 31 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 19 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 10 March 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 24 JUL 2016
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ('THE OBJECTS') ARE: TO ADVANCE IN LIFE AND RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF YOUNG PEOPLE UP TO THE AGE OF 21 YEARS WHO ARE RESIDENT IN THE COUNTY OF SOMERSET AND PARTICULARLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY LIVING IN THE LOCALITY OF ST ANDREW'S CHURCH CONGRESBURY THROUGH:- (1) DIRECTLY OR VIA THE SUPPORT OF OTHER CHARITABLE BODIES PROVIDE ASSISTANCE TO ACHIEVE SOME SPECIFIED GOAL THAT WILL CONTRIBUTE TO THEIR LIFE CHANCES AND PERSONAL FULFILMENT; (2) TO SUPPORT CHARITABLE BODIES THAT PROVIDE ACTIVITIES WHICH DEVELOP THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS; (3) TO SUPPORT CHARITABLE BODIES IN THEIR PROVISION OF RECREATIONAL AND LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES PROVIDED IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE, DESIGNED TO IMPROVE THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE VICARAGE
STATION ROAD
CONGRESBURY
BRISTOL
BS49 5DX
- Phone:
- 01934833126
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window