Accounts and annual returns CASTLE EDEN VILLAGE HALL ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1170570
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 10 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 10 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 10 May 2024 100 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 10 May 2024 100 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 25 November 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 25 November 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 10 November 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 10 November 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 04 March 2021 32 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 04 March 2021 32 days late Download Open in new window