Financial history CASTLE EDEN VILLAGE HALL ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1170570
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £12.70k £25.27k £26.00k £16.61k £18.69k
Total expenditure £8.48k £7.13k £9.00k £14.58k £11.49k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £22.24k £11.00k N/A N/A