CAUDWELL LYME DISEASE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Fundraising for scientific research into Lyme disease, awareness raising and public education on Lyme disease prevention and treatment, support for patients in the form of information and advice.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 26 September 2016: CIO registration
- CAUDWELL LYMECO CHARITY (Working name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JOHN CAUDWELL | Chair | 26 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
Emma Jane Sandbach | Trustee | 15 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Joanna Elizabeth Seabright | Trustee | 31 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Michael Fenton | Trustee | 06 October 2017 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £92.77k | £88.74k | £92.26k | £13.92k | £10.81k | |
|
Total expenditure | £70.55k | £52.25k | £31.37k | £27.22k | £6.16k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 28 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 28 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 December 2021
(These accounts |
31 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 26 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 26 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 30 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 30 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 26 Sep 2016
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE 1. TO PROMOTE AND PROTECT THE PHYSICAL AND EMOTIONAL HEALTH OF SUFFERERS OF LYME DISEASE AND ASSOCIATED DISEASES AND MEDICAL CONDITIONS IN THE UK AND BEYOND THROUGH THE PROVISION OF SUPPORT, EDUCATION AND PRACTICAL ADVICE; 2. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC THROUGHOUT THE UK AND BEYOND IN ALL AREAS RELATING TO LYME DISEASE AND ASSOCIATED DISEASES IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY RAISING AWARENESS, PROVIDING INFORMATION AND EDUCATIONAL MATERIALS AND DISSEMINATING RESEARCH, FOR THE BENEFIT OF ALL LYME DISEASE SUFFERERS, BOTH DIAGNOSED AND CURRENTLY UNDIAGNOSED; 3. TO PROMOTE, SUSTAIN AND INCREASE INDIVIDUAL AND COLLECTIVE KNOWLEDGE AND UNDERSTANDING ON THE SUBJECT OF LYME DISEASE AND ASSOCIATED DISEASES AND MEDICAL CONDITIONS AMONGST MEDICAL PROFESSIONALS, HEALTHCARE PROVIDERS AND THE SCIENTIFIC COMMUNITY IN THE UK AND BEYOND, BY COLLATING AND DISSEMINATING RESEARCH, BY CARRYING OUT RESEARCH AND BY MAKING GRANTS TO FUND SUCH RESEARCH AS THE TRUSTEES SEE FIT FROM TIME TO TIME FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, AND TO PUBLISH THE USEFUL RESULTS OF THAT RESEARCH, AND THROUGH SUCH OTHER MEANS AS THE TRUSTEES SEE FIT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
BROUGHTON HALL
BROUGHTON
ECCLESHALL
STAFFORD
ST21 6NS
- Phone:
- 01630620523
- Email:
- lymecocharity@caudwell.com
- Website:
-
caudwelllyme.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.