Financial history WALL HEATH EVANGELICAL FREE CHURCH

Charity Number: 1170571
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £302.59k £302.08k £485.00k £163.67k £166.57k
Total expenditure £111.64k £76.61k £94.31k £112.24k £174.35k
Income from government contracts £345 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A