Financial history TOTNES RUGBY FOOTBALL CLUB LIMITED

Charity Number: 1169891
Charity reporting is up to date (2 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2020 30/04/2021 30/04/2022 30/04/2023 30/04/2024
Total gross income £28.93k £68.22k £18.04k £12.66k £14.60k
Total expenditure £18.89k £34.01k £25.54k £18.12k £23.81k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £58.49k N/A N/A N/A