CHELTENHAM POWERCHAIR FOOTBALL CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
the provision of powerchair football training and matches for disabled people.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 10 October 2023
Total income includes £7,410 from 1 government grant(s)
People

3 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Gloucestershire
- South Gloucestershire
Governance
- 10 October 2016: CIO registration
- CPFC (Working name)
- Gloucestershire Powerchair Football Club (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Brian Dix | Chair | 10 October 2016 |
|
|||||||
Jeremy Bullock | Trustee | 16 September 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Nicholas Craig Stoddart | Trustee | 16 September 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 10/10/2019 | 10/10/2020 | 10/10/2021 | 10/10/2022 | 10/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £13.57k | £14.73k | £11.82k | £31.54k | £24.69k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.13k | £6.47k | £15.55k | £21.15k | £28.88k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £11.89k | N/A | £11.70k | £7.41k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 10 October 2023 | 05 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 10 October 2023 | 05 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 10 October 2022 | 08 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 10 October 2022 | 08 August 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 10 October 2021 | 03 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 10 October 2021 | 03 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 10 October 2020 | 28 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 10 October 2020 | 28 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 10 October 2019 | 05 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 10 October 2019 | 05 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 10 Oct 2016
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS THE RELIEF OF DISABLED PERSONS IN CHELTENHAM BY ENCOURAGING AND FACILITATING THEM IN POWERCHAIR FOOTBALL AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF TRAINING FACILITIES AND EQUIPMENT FOR THIS PURPOSE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
22 KINGSCOTE DRIVE
ABBEYMEAD
GLOUCESTER
GL4 4XT
- Phone:
- 07907113145
- Email:
- info@thecpfc.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window