THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST. JOHN AND ST. ANNE, HYTHE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Parochial Church Council works with the vicar to promote the work of the Church of England within the Ecclesiastical Parish of St. John and St. Anne, Hythe, Southampton
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £876 from 1 government grant(s)
People

16 Trustee(s)
35 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Hampshire
Governance
- 15 August 2016: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
16 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Lee Davies | Chair | 12 January 2022 |
|
|||||
Nicola Jane Higgins | Trustee | 08 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Timothy James Rowlandson | Trustee | 08 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Charles Pearce | Trustee | 25 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN MARY HARVEY | Trustee | 25 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Patricia Jean Pearce | Trustee | 25 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
DAVID BLOMLEY | Trustee | 25 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
MARTIN HARRY DEADMAN | Trustee | 25 April 2021 |
|
|||||
Carol Moody | Trustee | 20 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Craig Douglas Fowkes | Trustee | 20 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Mary Preston | Trustee | 20 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Pamela Jane Letita Gilson | Trustee | 20 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN ALICE BLOMLEY | Trustee | 28 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
ELIZABETH ANNE DEADMAN | Trustee | 28 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
PHILIP JOHN PRESTON | Trustee | 28 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
PETER MAXWELL LAWSON | Trustee | 28 April 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £158.25k | £111.70k | £108.09k | £225.11k | £135.92k | |
|
Total expenditure | £155.52k | £127.53k | £122.72k | £129.05k | £138.48k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £876 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 26 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 26 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 07 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 07 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 03 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 03 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 15 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 15 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES THAT CAME INTO FORCE ON 02 JAN 1957
Charitable objects
PROMOTING IN THE PARISH THE WHOLE MISSION OF THE CHURCH
Contact information
- Address:
-
St. John's Hall
New Road
Hythe
SOUTHAMPTON
SO45 6BP
- Phone:
- 02380844336
- Email:
- office@stjohnshythe.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window