BRITISH FRIENDS OF NEVE SHALOM - WAHAT AL-SALAM

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Financial support of the educational programmes of Neve Shalom / Wahat al-Salam that promote peace and equality, and advocacy in the UK about this work.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

12 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
Governance
- 08 February 2017: CIO registration
- 11 January 2020: Funds received from 290062 BRITISH FRIENDS OF NEVE SHALOM
- OASIS OF PEACE UK (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Edoardo El-Attrache | Trustee | 02 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Justin Anthony Cohen | Trustee | 08 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
David Altaras | Trustee | 01 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Silman | Trustee | 26 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Jack Omer Jackaman | Trustee | 25 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ghanem Nuseibeh | Trustee | 06 September 2017 |
|
|||||
ANTHONY PAUL WARSHAW | Trustee | 06 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Laurence Stephen Brass | Trustee | 12 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
SIR ANDREW BURNS KCMG | Trustee | 12 July 2017 |
|
|||||
TONY HYAMS | Trustee | 06 August 2013 |
|
|
||||
LADY SARAH BURNS | Trustee | 10 March 2006 |
|
|
||||
JENNY NEMKO | Trustee | 01 January 2000 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £282.52k | £208.99k | £535.63k | £113.58k | £327.40k | |
|
Total expenditure | £205.05k | £203.18k | £309.06k | £204.24k | £257.69k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £18.16k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | £534.09k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | £1.50k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | £41 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | £376.10k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | £273.84k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | £35.22k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | £7.38k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | £241.99k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 17 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 17 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 28 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 28 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 25 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 25 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 19 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 19 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 18 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 18 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 08 Feb 2017
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN GENERAL, BUT WITH PARTICULAR REFERENCE TO NEVE SHALOM-WAHAT AL-SALAM (NSWAS) IN SUCH WAYS AS SHALL BE THOUGHT FIT BUT IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF THE FOLLOWING: (A) EDUCATIONAL PROJECTS OF BOTH JEWS AND ARABS ABOUT NSWAS AND THE SUBJECTS OF SOCIAL EQUALITY, COHESION AND UNITY AND DIVERSITY; (B) FINANCIAL OR OTHER SUPPORT OF THE MAINTENANCE, REPAIR OR PROVISION OF EDUCATIONAL OR OTHER FESTIVITIES IN NSWAS; (C) SCHOLARSHIPS AND OTHER FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE FOR BOTH JEWS AND ARABS TO ENABLE THEM TO ATTEND COURSES OR SEMINARS AT NSWAS. 3.2 THE PROMOTION OF RACIAL AND RELIGIOUS HARMONY FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY EDUCATING THE PUBLIC ABOUT NSWAS AND HOW IT'S WORK HAS BROUGHT TOGETHER THE JEWISH AND ARAB COMMUNITIES IN PEACE AND HARMONY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Oasis of Peace UK
124-128 City Road
LONDON
EC1V 2NX
- Phone:
- 02089524717
- Email:
- office@oasisofpeace.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window