Trustees BRITISH FRIENDS OF NEVE SHALOM - WAHAT AL-SALAM
Charity number: 1171524

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Edoardo El-Attrache | Trustee | 02 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Justin Anthony Cohen | Trustee | 08 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
David Altaras | Trustee | 01 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Silman | Trustee | 26 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Jack Omer Jackaman | Trustee | 25 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ghanem Nuseibeh | Trustee | 06 September 2017 |
|
|||||
ANTHONY PAUL WARSHAW | Trustee | 06 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Laurence Stephen Brass | Trustee | 12 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
SIR ANDREW BURNS KCMG | Trustee | 12 July 2017 |
|
|||||
TONY HYAMS | Trustee | 06 August 2013 |
|
|
||||
LADY SARAH BURNS | Trustee | 10 March 2006 |
|
|
||||
JENNY NEMKO | Trustee | 01 January 2000 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.