MARTIN ROBERTS FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Martin Roberts Foundation is the brainchild of TV presenter, Martin Roberts as a vehicle to raise money to support carefully selected educational and well-being initiatives for children and young people. As a long time supporter and campaigner for the NSPCC , Martin set up the charity to help address the need for ongoing awareness of charities like Childline amongst children and young people.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 08 May 2017: CIO registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
COLIN GLASS | Trustee | 26 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
KIRSTY ROBERTS | Trustee | 01 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
JEFFREY BUTLER | Trustee | 08 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
POLLY LUDLOW JONES | Trustee | 07 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
PHILIP PETER GAMBRILL FCCA | Trustee | 01 May 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £310 | £53.50k | £771 | £1.90k | £515 | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.80k | £59.05k | £2 | £3.00k | £2.80k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 04 April 2025 | 4 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | 04 April 2025 | 4 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 07 October 2024 | 190 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | 07 October 2024 | 190 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 29 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | 29 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 31 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | 31 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 24 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | 24 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 08 May 2017
Charitable objects
4. THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: (A) TO PROVIDE HELP FOR CHILDREN THROUGH EDUCATION, INFORMATION AND ACTIVITIES TO DEVELOP THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS INDEPENDENT, MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS; (B) TO ADVANCE THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF HUMAN SUFFERING IN CHILDREN AND TO ASSIST THE RECOVERY OF CHILDREN THROUGH A RANGE OF CHARITABLE ACTIVITIES THAT ARE DIRECTED TOWARDS SAVING AND PROTECTING THOSE WHOSE LIVES ARE IN DANGER; (C) TO ADVANCE AND PROMOTE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT THE PROTECTION OF CHILDREN THROUGH RAISING AWARENESS AND THE EDUCATION OF PERSONAL AND HEALTH & SAFETY ISSUES; (D) TO PROVIDE RELIEF TO CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE IN NEED THROUGH AMONGST OTHER THINGS THE SUPPORT OF OTHER CHARITIES AND ORGANISATIONS IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT LIMITED TO THOSE CONCERNED WITH THE PROVISION OF CARE AND PROTECTION TO CHILDREN;
Contact information
- Address:
-
Martin Roberts Foundation
Wesleyan Chambers
Park Road
Paulton
Bristol
BS39 7QQ
- Phone:
- 07786 002578
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window