TELEEEG

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We provide free EEG equipment, local staff training and remote EEG interpretation (TeleEEG) for epilepsy clinics in the developing world.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
185 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
- Afghanistan
- Albania
- Algeria
- American Samoa
- Angola
- Argentina
- Armenia
- Azerbaijan
- Bangladesh
- Belarus
- Belize
- Benin
- Bhutan
- Bolivia
- Bosnia And Herzegovina
- Botswana
- Brazil
- Bulgaria
- Burkina Faso
- Burundi
- Cambodia
- Cameroon
- Cape Verde
- Central African Republic
- Chad
- China
- Colombia
- Comoros
- Congo (Democratic Republic)
- Costa Rica
- Cuba
- Djibouti
- Dominica
- Dominican Republic
- East Timor
- Ecuador
- Egypt
- El Salvador
- Eritrea
- Eswatini
- Ethiopia
- Fiji
- Gabon
- Georgia
- Ghana
- Grenada
- Guatemala
- Guinea
- Guinea-bissau
- Guyana
- Haiti
- Honduras
- India
- Indonesia
- Iran
- Iraq
- Jamaica
- Jordan
- Kazakhstan
- Kenya
- Kiribati
- Kosovo
- Kyrgyzstan
- Laos
- Lebanon
- Lesotho
- Liberia
- Libya
- Macedonia
- Madagascar
- Malawi
- Maldives
- Mali
- Marshall Islands
- Mauritania
- Mauritius
- Mexico
- Micronesia
- Moldova
- Mongolia
- Montenegro
- Morocco
- Mozambique
- Namibia
- Nepal
- Nicaragua
- Niger
- Nigeria
- Pakistan
- Palau
- Panama
- Papua New Guinea
- Paraguay
- Philippines
- Romania
- Russia
- Rwanda
- Samoa
- São Tomé And Principe
- Senegal
- Serbia
- Seychelles
- Sierra Leone
- Solomon Islands
- Somalia
- South Africa
- Sudan
- Suriname
- Tajikistan
- Tanzania
- Thailand
- The Gambia
- Togo
- Tonga
- Tunisia
- Turkey
- Turkmenistan
- Tuvalu
- Uganda
- Ukraine
- Uzbekistan
- Vanuatu
- Venezuela
- Vietnam
- Yemen
- Zambia
- Zimbabwe
Governance
- 23 August 2016: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Stephen Coates | Chair | 23 August 2016 |
|
|
||||
Charlotte Stow | Trustee | 25 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL WRIGHT | Trustee | 23 August 2016 |
|
|
||||
Dr TAN CHONG TIN | Trustee | 23 August 2016 |
|
|
||||
ANNE CLARKE | Trustee | 23 August 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2019 | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £22.90k | £36.27k | £23.75k | £44.08k | £27.80k | |
|
Total expenditure | £16.40k | £12.07k | £28.25k | £40.25k | £46.12k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 30 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | 30 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 28 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | 28 August 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 28 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | 28 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 01 September 2021 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | 01 September 2021 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | 31 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | 31 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Association Registered 23 Aug 2016
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE TO RELIEVE SICKNESS AND TO PRESERVE HEALTH AMONG PEOPLE WITH EPILEPSY IN DEVELOPING COUNTRIES BY PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF EEG EQUIPMENT, FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE, SUPPORT, EDUCATION AND PRACTICAL ADVICE. NOTHING IN THIS CONSTITUTION SHALL AUTHORISE AN APPLICATION OF THE PROPERTY OF THE CIO FOR THE PURPOSES WHICH ARE NOT CHARITABLE IN ACCORDANCE WITH SECTION 7 OF THE CHARITIES AND TRUSTEE INVESTMENT (SCOTLAND) ACT 2005 AND SECTION 2 OF THE CHARITIES ACT (NORTHERN IRELAND) 2008.
Contact information
- Address:
-
The White House
15 Holywell Avenue
Whitley Bay
Tyne and Wear
NE26 3AH
- Phone:
- 07540453486
- Email:
- admin@teleeeg.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window