Financial history APOSTOLIC EVANGELICAL CHURCH OF THE NAME OF JESUS

Charity number: 1169988
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £20.72k £23.99k £29.65k £45.71k £45.52k
Total expenditure £23.47k £18.11k £29.69k £41.77k £39.05k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A