THE ELLESMERE PORT AND NESTON TALKING NEWSPAPER FOR THE VISUALLY IMPAIRED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Providing memory sticks and on-line/smartphone application access to our Talking Newspaper for the blind & partially sighted.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

1 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Cheshire West & Chester
Governance
- 30 March 1979: Standard registration
- THE ELLESMERE PORT AND NESTON TALKING NEWSPAPER FOR THE VISUALLY HANDICAPPED (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
BRYAN GWYNFRYN HOBDAY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.24k | £667 | £1.41k | £350 | £646 | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.86k | £818 | £587 | £1.24k | £1.21k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 02 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 02 August 2024 | 184 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 05 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 21 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 13 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 15 MARCH 1979 AS AMENDED 2 JULY 1991 AS AMENDED 18 JULY 2001, 17 JULY 2002 AND 14 JULY 2010.
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THE BLIND, OR THE PARTIALLY SIGHTED, OR THOSE LABOURING UNDER SOME TEMPORARY OR PERMANENT INCAPACITY OR DISABILITY WHICH MAKES READING A STRAIN, BY THE PROVISION OF RECORDED TAPES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
11 DEBRA CLOSE
GREAT SUTTON
ELLESMERE PORT
CH66 4SH
- Phone:
- 01513392814
- Email:
- epnsoundnews@gmail.com
- Website:
-
epnsoundnews.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window