Paper Foundation

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Located close to the historic James Cropper paper-mill in Burneside, a village in the English Lake District. Preserve and perpetuate knowledge and skills related to paper and associated arts Provide a living institution for paper devotees and practitioners Curate festivals and events making paper and associated arts exciting and accessible to broadest possible audience
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £14,612 from 1 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 24 March 2017: Standard registration
- CROPPER FOUNDATION (Previous name)
- Cropper Paper Foundation (Previous name)
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MARK CROPPER | Chair | 24 March 2017 |
|
|
||||||
PENELOPE ANN HYLTON ELLIOTT | Trustee | 12 October 2022 |
|
|||||||
Edward William George Bayntun-Coward DL | Trustee | 23 June 2020 |
|
|||||||
ATTOSA CROPPER | Trustee | 27 March 2017 |
|
|||||||
PATRICK WILLINK | Trustee | 24 March 2017 |
|
|
||||||
JAMES SHARP | Trustee | 24 March 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £56.26k | £50.00k | £54.01k | £134.20k | £266.53k | |
|
Total expenditure | £14.87k | £77.28k | £46.15k | £105.75k | £145.16k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £14.61k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 11 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 11 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 15 November 2023 | 15 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 15 November 2023 | 15 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 26 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 26 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 06 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 06 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 23 NOV 2016 as amended on 08 Nov 2018 as amended on 09 Dec 2022
Charitable objects
THE ONLY OBJECTS FOR WHICH THE CHARITY IS ESTABLISHED ARE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT: 1. TO FURTHER SUCH EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE OBJECTS AS THE CHARITY TRUSTEES MAY IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION DETERMINE, INCLUDING IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: (A) PRESERVING THE SCIENCE, TECHNOLOGY AND ART OF PAPER MAKING AND ASSOCIATED CRAFTS TOGETHER WITH THEIR TRADITIONS, CULTURE AND HERITAGE; AND (B) ADVANCING AND PROMOTING THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN PAPER MAKING AND ASSOCIATED CRAFTS, INCLUDING TRADITIONAL TECHNIQUES, PROCESSES AND PRACTICES; AND 2 TO FURTHER SUCH EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE OBJECTS IN BURNESIDE AND THE SURROUNDING AREA IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES AS THE TRUSTEES MAY IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION DETERMINE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Ellergreen Estate Office
Burneside
Kendal
LA9 5SD
- Phone:
- 01539726013
- Email:
- tom@paper.foundation
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window