HUNSWORTH COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We the trustees of the centre keep the centre operating for the benefit of the local community and we do annual coffee mornings for the community and every Christmas we do a free community get together this by means of giving back to the village we run the centre voluntary and we are full with local activities everyday this means we can keep running and hopefully the centre will be there for ever
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 November 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Throughout England
Governance
- 07 November 2016: CIO registration
- 20 November 2018: Funds received from 513381 HUNSWORTH COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Kevin Brown | Chair | 07 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
Janice Barlow | Trustee | 07 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
KATHERINE SHINGLETON | Trustee | 07 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
PATRICIA TURNER | Trustee | 07 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
Paula Mcdonald | Trustee | 07 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
PHILIP SMITH | Trustee | 07 November 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/11/2019 | 30/11/2020 | 30/11/2021 | 30/11/2022 | 30/11/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £14.79k | £8.13k | £7.64k | £11.91k | £13.49k | |
|
Total expenditure | £13.43k | £9.50k | £7.53k | £10.56k | £15.17k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 November 2023 | 27 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2023 | 27 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2022 | 05 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2022 | 05 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2021 | 17 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2021 | 17 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2020 | 17 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2020 | 17 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2019 | 17 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2019 | 17 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 07 Nov 2016
Charitable objects
A) TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF HUNSWORTH AND THE SURROUNDING AREA (HEREINAFTER CALLED THE "AREA OF BENEFIT") WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS, AND INHABITANTS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS. B) TO ESTABLISH OR TO SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE (HEREINAFTER CALLED "THE CENTRE") AND TO MAINTAIN AND MANAGE OR TO CO-OPERATE WITH ANY LOCAL STATUTORY AUTHORITY IN THE MAINTENANCE AND MANAGEMENT OF SUCH A CENTRE FOR ACTIVITIES PROMOTED BY THE ASSOCIATION AND ITS CONSTITUENT BODIES IN FURTHERANCE OF THE ABOVE OBJECT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
67 PYENOT HALL LANE
CLECKHEATON
BD19 5BA
- Phone:
- 01274871101
- Email:
- STEVENRICHI@AOL.COM
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window