Accounts and annual returns KILBURN COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity Number: 508595
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 29 February 2024 29 July 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2024 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2023 08 February 2024 42 days late
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2023 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2022 06 November 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2022 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2021 17 January 2022 20 days late
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2021 Not Required
Annual return 29 February 2020 08 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2020 Not Required