Accounts and annual returns STAMFORD AFC (THE YOUNG DANIELS)

Charity Number: 1171036
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2024 19 March 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2024 19 March 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2023 06 February 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023 06 February 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2022 04 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022

(These accounts
have been qualified)

04 January 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2021 16 November 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021

(These accounts
have been qualified)

16 November 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2020 25 September 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 25 September 2020 On Time Download Open in new window