TAMWORTH HAVE A HEART

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We fund and install publicly accessible AED's (defibrillators) across Tamworth and surrounding areas. All our AED's are installed in registered cabinets at key locations registered with the WMAS. New sites are always being identified and funding sought. We also provide CPR and AED training to groups and schools in the surrounding area.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Staffordshire
- Warwickshire
Governance
- 30 January 2017: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Stuart Dawson | Chair | 02 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Fitzpatrick | Trustee | 29 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Melvin Watson | Trustee | 02 January 2019 |
|
|||||
Ben Culff | Trustee | 02 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
VICTORIA VERNON | Trustee | 04 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
KEITH DAWSON | Trustee | 03 August 2016 |
|
|
||||
Richard John Samuel Kingstone | Trustee | 03 August 2016 |
|
|||||
MARK KYTE | Trustee | 03 August 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £21.65k | £5.68k | £23.81k | £15.91k | £24.22k | |
|
Total expenditure | £18.81k | £4.80k | £21.62k | £22.08k | £19.66k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £900 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 08 February 2025 | 8 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 16 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 19 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 20 May 2021 | 109 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 13 APR 2016 AS AMENDED ON 23 JAN 2017
Charitable objects
THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF HEALTH AND THE SAVING OF LIVES BY THE PROVISION OF DEFIBRILLATORS AND ANCILLARY EQUIPMENT IN PUBLIC PLACES IN TAMWORTH AND THE SURROUNDING DISTRICTS AND BY PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF TRAINING IN CPR AND IN THE USE OF DEFIBRILLATORS TO THE LOCAL COMMUNITY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
30 June Crescent
Amington
TAMWORTH
Staffordshire
B77 3BH
- Phone:
- 07525 028665
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window