MOORLAND STAR

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
MoorlandSTAR provide a hot 2course meal on Tuesdays, Wednesdays & Thursday. We are lunch club for the over 50s in the Splott area. We also host special events including Bingo and offer alternative therapies. We run regular day trips & a timetable of themed events throughout the year. We work closely with our community and are integral to supporting older people .
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 April 2024
Total income includes £20,047 from 1 government contract(s) and £20,047 from 1 government grant(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Recreation
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Cardiff
Governance
- 18 October 2016: CIO registration
- MOORLAND COMMUNITY CENTRE - SPLOTT (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
GLYN Perriman | Chair | 01 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
PATRITCIA SOUTER | Trustee | 07 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
REBECCA BRYANT | Trustee | 05 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rev DEAN ATKINS | Trustee | 05 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
ELIZABETH NORMAN | Trustee | 05 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
LILY HOLLAND | Trustee | 01 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sam Speller | Trustee | 26 March 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/04/2020 | 01/04/2021 | 01/04/2022 | 01/04/2023 | 01/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £73.92k | £135.04k | £36.14k | £60.76k | £119.15k | |
|
Total expenditure | £58.91k | £78.78k | £71.29k | £78.23k | £91.13k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £18.53k | £20.05k | |
|
Income from government grants | £21.75k | £57.69k | £25.42k | £2.23k | £20.05k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 April 2024 | 14 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 April 2023 | 23 February 2024 | 22 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2023 | 23 February 2024 | 22 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 April 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 April 2021 | 28 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2021 | 28 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 April 2020 | 31 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2020 | 15 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 18 Oct 2016
Charitable objects
1. TO PROMOTE SOCIAL INCLUSION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY PREVENTING PEOPLE FROM BECOMING SOCIALLY EXCLUDED, RELIEVING THE NEEDS OF THOSE PEOPLE WHO ARE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED AND ASSISTING THEM TO INTEGRATE INTO SOCIETY. FOR THE PURPOSE OF THIS CLAUSE ‘SOCIALLY EXCLUDED’ MEANS BEING EXCLUDED FROM SOCIETY, OR PART OF SOCIETY, AS A RESULT OF BEING A MEMBER OF A SOCIALLY AND ECONOMICALLY DEPRIVED COMMUNITY. 2. TO FURTHER OR BENEFIT THE RESIDENTS OF SPLOTT, TREMORFA ADAMSDOWN AND ROATH AREAS OF CARDIFF AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD, WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID RESIDENTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECTIVE OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE RESIDENTS. IN FURTHERANCE OF THESE OBJECTS BUT NOT OTHERWISE, THE TRUSTEES SHALL HAVE POWER: TO ESTABLISH OR SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE AND TO MAINTAIN OR MANAGE OR CO-OPERATE WITH ANY STATUTORY AUTHORITY IN THE MAINTENANCE AND MANAGEMENT OF SUCH A CENTRE FOR ACTIVITIES PROMOTED BY THE CHARITY IN FURTHERANCE OF THE ABOVE OBJECTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
MOORLAND COMMUNITY CENTRE
MOORLAND ROAD
SPLOTT
CARDIFF
CF24 2LG
- Phone:
- 02921328845
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window