OSCAR'S WISH FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Oscar's Wish Foundation offers comfort and support to Parents & Birthing people, family members and siblings who have experienced the devastating loss of a precious baby before (Miscarriage), during (Stillbirth) or shortly after (Neonatal) birth. We have a range of resources, information and support programmes. These have been designed to help in the days, weeks and months following a loss.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Throughout England
Governance
- 25 October 2016: Standard registration
- OWF (Working name)
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Emily Nisbet-Hawkins | Chair | 18 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jessica Webber | Trustee | 21 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kelly McLaren | Trustee | 21 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas Rawlinson | Trustee | 23 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Kara Carling | Trustee | 23 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
GEMMA JAYNE KYBERT | Trustee | 14 February 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2019 | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £24.99k | £35.52k | £48.27k | £38.33k | £52.89k | |
|
Total expenditure | £39.76k | £34.13k | £35.62k | £40.51k | £47.86k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £20.93k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 15 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | 25 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 27 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | 15 March 2024 | 197 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 21 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | 20 September 2022 | 20 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 15 September 2021 | 15 days late | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 October 2020
(These accounts |
28 October 2021 | 58 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | 10 December 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 14 FEB 2015 AS AMENDED ON 16 SEP 2016 as amended on 15 Aug 2018 as amended on 18 Jun 2019
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THE SUFFERING AND EMOTIONAL DISTRESS AMONGST PARENTS AND FAMILIES WHO HAVE EXPERIENCED THE LOSS OF A BABY THROUGH STILLBIRTH OR NEONATAL DEATH, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY, SUPPORTING NEWLY BEREAVED PARENTS BY THE PROVISION OF BEREAVEMENT PACKS, SUPPORT, RAISING AWARENESS AND PROVIDING A SUPPORT NETWORK.
Contact information
- Address:
-
23 Tulip Tree Road
West Durrington
Worthing
Worthing
West Sussex
BN13 3FZ
- Phone:
- 07843410895
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window